Global Patent Index - EP 1003316 A2

EP 1003316 A2 2000-05-24 - Filtered plug-socket assembly for telephone systems or the like

Title (en)

Filtered plug-socket assembly for telephone systems or the like

Title (de)

Stecker/Buchse Filteranordnung für Fernsprechsysteme oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Assemblage Fiche/Douille avec filtrage pour des systèmes téléphoniques ou similaires

Publication

EP 1003316 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99440320 A

Priority

IT MI982515 A

Abstract (en)

A filtered plug-socket assembly (10), e.g. a three-pole one, is described for the simultaneous connection of several telephone apparatus, such as telephone sets, facsimile, modems, etc.. The assembly, in accordance with the invention, comprises a three-pole plug, a three-pole socket and at least an RJ or equivalent socket. In addition, a filter element and a bridging connection between two of the pins of the three-pole plug are provided for changing the configuration of an system from "master-slave" to "parallel". In the case where the system is already a parallel one, the use of the assembly in accordance with the invention does not result in any variation i.e. the various sockets remain in parallel configuration. The assembly according to the invention has small dimensions, is cheap and practical and avoids the intervention of high-cost skilled personnel for the modification of the system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/02; H04M 1/723

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04M 1/723 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/723 (2013.01); H04M 1/0293 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003316 A2 20000524; EP 1003316 A3 20030702; IT 1303840 B1 20010301; IT MI982515 A1 20000522

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040316

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI