Global Patent Index - EP 1003352 A3

EP 1003352 A3 2001-03-14 - Radiant electric heaters and its manufacturing process

Title (en)

Radiant electric heaters and its manufacturing process

Title (de)

Strahlungsheizkörper und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Eléments de chauffage électrique rayonnants et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1003352 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122547 A

Priority

DE 19853542 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1003352A2] The radiation heating body is electrically heated and has a brightly radiating heating element (32), pref. of a halogen lamp type, and a heating body carrier with thermal insulation, a base (14) and an outer edge (16) for contact with the underside of a cooker plate, pref. a glass ceramic plate, and an intermediate edge (21) separating two independently operated heating zones. A light screen (25) is mounted near a height compensation arrangement (23) used to match the height of the intermediate and outer edges An Independent claim is also included for a method of manufacturing a radiation heating body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/744 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003352 A2 20000524; EP 1003352 A3 20010314; DE 19853542 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020603

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI