Global Patent Index - EP 1003395 A1

EP 1003395 A1 2000-05-31 - BAG COMPRISING MATCHING CLOSING SECTIONS ACTUATED BY A SLIDER

Title (en)

BAG COMPRISING MATCHING CLOSING SECTIONS ACTUATED BY A SLIDER

Title (de)

BEUTEL MIT KOMPLEMENTÄREN PROFILVERSCHLUSSSTREIFEN MIT SCHIEBER

Title (fr)

SACHET COMPRENANT DES PROFILES DE FERMETURE COMPLEMENTAIRES ACTIONNES PAR CURSEUR

Publication

EP 1003395 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99925120 A

Priority

  • FR 9901455 W
  • FR 9807658 A
  • FR 9808019 A
  • FR 9808525 A
  • FR 9813732 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780037A1] The invention concerns a bag comprising two generally parallel sheets (16, 18) forming the bag main walls, matching closing sections (20, 22) respectively fixed on said sheets and a slider (50) actuating the sections (20, 22) for closing and opening. The invention is characterised in that it further comprises, parallel to the closing sections (20, 22), between said sheets (16, 18) and at the bag opening (12), additional raised relief means (100) designed to ensure tightness by forming a barrier between the sheets (16, 18), when the bag is closed, said additional raised relief means (100) being placed opposite the slider (50) flanks (52, 54) to be urged towards their sealing position by the slider (50) when the slider is moved towards the sealing position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 19/16; A44B 19/26; B65D 33/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/16 (2006.01); A44B 19/26 (2006.01); B65D 33/02 (2006.01); B65D 33/16 (2006.01); B65D 33/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/02 (2013.01); B65D 33/2591 (2013.01); A44B 19/16 (2013.01); A44B 19/267 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2532 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2534 (2013.01); Y10T 24/44291 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965353A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780039 A1 19991224; FR 2780039 B1 20000908; AT 216567 T 20020515; AU 4151699 A 20000105; AU 760238 B2 20030508; BR 9906505 A 20000919; CA 2296748 A1 19991223; CA 2296748 C 20090908; DE 69901328 D1 20020529; DE 69901328 T2 20021031; DK 1003395 T3 20020819; EP 1003395 A1 20000531; EP 1003395 B1 20020424; ES 2174612 T3 20021101; FR 2780037 A1 19991224; FR 2780037 B1 20000908; NZ 502297 A 20010928; US 2002034339 A1 20020321; US 2002034340 A1 20020321; US 2002034341 A1 20020321; US 2002034342 A1 20020321; US 2002034343 A1 20020321; US 2002034344 A1 20020321; US 2005286809 A1 20051229; US 6609827 B2 20030826; US 6632021 B2 20031014; US 6733178 B2 20040511; US 6755569 B2 20040629; US 6761481 B1 20040713; US 6902321 B2 20050607; US 7140772 B2 20061128; US 7517150 B2 20090414; WO 9965353 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-10-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2004-11-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FLEXICO-FRANCE

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-06-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174612 T3

2002-08-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-06-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-06-19 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020619

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-06-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020614

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-06-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901328 20020529

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216567 T 20020515

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLEXICO-FRANCE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE