Global patent index - EP 1003401 A1

EP 1003401 A1 2000-05-31 - TWINNED KITCHEN FURNITURE SYSTEM, IN PARTICULAR TO BE WALL-MOUNTED WITH OR WITHOUT BOTTOM SUPPORT

Title (en)

TWINNED KITCHEN FURNITURE SYSTEM, IN PARTICULAR TO BE WALL-MOUNTED WITH OR WITHOUT BOTTOM SUPPORT

Title (de)

KÜCHENMÖBELSYSTEM IN WANGENBAUWEISE, INSBESONDERE ZUR UN- UND/ODER BEDINGTEN WANDMONTAGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE MEUBLES DE CUISINE CONSTITUE DE JUMELLES, EN PARTICULIER POUR LE MONTAGE MURAL AVEC OU SANS SUPPORT INFERIEUR

Publication

EP 1003401 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943669 A

Priority

  • DE 9801923 W
  • DE 19735905 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735905A1] The lighting strip (10) is mounted integral between adjoining panels (27) of the back wall on a vertically aligned multi-function profiled section (12). The width of the strip corresponds to that of the profiled section and its length corresponds to the length of the section which can be seen by the user. The light strip has engagement elements engaging in the multi function profiled section. At least two opposing lamp sockets (16) are provided for a small diameter fluorescent tube (17) on a U-section base (19) which projects completely on the open side into the profile section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 95/00; A47B 51/00; A47B 96/20; E06B 3/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/04 (2006.01); A47B 97/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/02 (2013.01); A47B 77/04 (2013.01); A47B 97/00 (2013.01); F21S 8/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814749 U1 19981119; AT 233061 T 20030315; DE 19735905 A1 19990225; EP 1003401 A1 20000531; EP 1003401 B1 20030226; WO 9908567 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-09-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040920

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031127

2004-01-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020222

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OPITZ, MICHAEL

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TRAUTWEIN, PETER

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHMID, MAX

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT