Global patent index - EP 1003407 A1

EP 1003407 A1 2000-05-31 - SPOON

Title (en)

SPOON

Title (de)

ESSLÖFFEL

Title (fr)

CUILLERE A SOUPE

Publication

EP 1003407 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945008 A

Priority

  • DE 9802006 W
  • DE 19731429 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6467175B2] The invention relates to a spoon for receiving soft or liquid food. Said spoon has a handle with an attached mouthpiece constructed of soft and flexible material. The aim of the invention is to significantly simplify the manner in which food is received by small children and people with facial paralysis. The spoon has a practical shape in that the mouthpiece is trough-shaped and concave and has a level defining upper edge, whereby the thickness of the mouthpiece in the front and on the lateral side is proportional so that its concave shape can be inverted by the pressure of the tongue (Z) during swallowing and the mouthpiece can adapt to the arched shape of the hard palate (G) in a sagital and transversal direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904674A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

US 2002026715 A1 20020307; US 6467175 B2 20021022; AT 234037 T 20030315; CA 2297014 A1 19990204; EP 1003407 A1 20000531; EP 1003407 B1 20030312; ES 2195387 T3 20031201; JP 2001510694 A 20010807; WO 9904674 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070717

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070717

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOHM-VAN DIGGELEN BERND

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050718

2006-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060725

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-07-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050717

2004-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030616

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807482

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020604

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT