Global patent index - EP 1003408 A1

EP 1003408 A1 2000-05-31 - HIGH RACK DENSITY SHIP-ON HANGER WITH ANTI-DISLODGEMENT MEANS

Title (en)

HIGH RACK DENSITY SHIP-ON HANGER WITH ANTI-DISLODGEMENT MEANS

Title (de)

KLEIDERBÜGEL MIT HOHER LAGERUNGSDICHTE UND ANTI-ENTFERNUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

PORTEMANTEAUX POUR RANGEMENT HAUTE DENSITE ET EXPEDITION AVEC DISPOSITIFS DE RAPPEL ET ANTI-DECROCHAGE

Publication

EP 1003408 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99928466 A

Priority

  • US 9912802 W
  • US 9822498 A
  • US 12813198 A
  • US 15241998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965371A1] A ship-on garment hanger (10) having ramp means (39, 40) on the hanger body to prevent dislodgement of a garment from the hanger by outwardly directly dislodging forces and end shields (50) on the outside edges of the clamps to prevent dislodgement of a garment from the garment hanger by inwardly directed dislodging forces, the hanger being nestable with similar hangers to maximize shipping space.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/14 (2006.01); A47G 25/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/485 (2013.01); A47G 25/1442 (2013.01); A47G 2025/484 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965371 A1 19991223; WO 9965371 A9 20000720; AT 320740 T 20060415; AU 4552899 A 20000105; DE 69930514 D1 20060511; DE 69930514 T2 20061005; EP 1003408 A1 20000531; EP 1003408 A4 20030108; EP 1003408 B1 20060322; ES 2259236 T3 20060916; MX PA00001623 A 20020604; PT 1003408 E 20060731

INPADOC legal status

2016-03-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20060402172

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20110104

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120616

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120615

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69930514

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120615

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120616

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120615

2013-01-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110613

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110104

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101215

2010-12-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20101215

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090604

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2008-10-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060615

2008-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-01-31 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GHA BRANDS LTD., MY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20070104

2006-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2259236

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-08-03 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20060402172

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2006-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Effective date: 20060515

2006-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-06-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-06-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69930514

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-05-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-04-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-03-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-01-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20021125

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47G 25/14 A, 7A 47G 25/48 B

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE