Global Patent Index - EP 1003493 A1

EP 1003493 A1 2000-05-31 - USE OF SELECTIVE RXR AGONISTS TO PREVENT SURGICAL ADHESIONS

Title (en)

USE OF SELECTIVE RXR AGONISTS TO PREVENT SURGICAL ADHESIONS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON SELEKTIVEN RXR AGONISTEN ZUR VORBEUGUNG CHIRURGISCHER ADHÄSIONEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'AGONISTES SELECTIFS VIS-A-VIS DES RECEPTEURS RXR POUR EVITER LES ADHERENCES RESULTANT D'INTERVENTIONS CHIRURGICALES

Publication

EP 1003493 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98938064 A

Priority

  • US 9815625 W
  • US 5401797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906036A1] Certain retinoid derivatives, most or all of which are selective RXR retinoid agonists, have been found to be useful in the prevention or minimization of surgical adhesion formation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/07; A61K 31/19; A61K 31/335; A61K 31/38; A61K 31/385; A61K 31/39; A61P 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 317/30 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); A61K 31/357 (2006.01); A61K 31/385 (2006.01); A61K 31/39 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 41/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 319/06 (2006.01); C07D 339/06 (2006.01); C07D 339/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/357 (2013.01); A61K 31/385 (2013.01); A61K 31/39 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906036 A1 19990211; AU 733236 B2 20010510; AU 8667098 A 19990222; CA 2295807 A1 19990211; EP 1003493 A1 20000531; EP 1003493 A4 20020327; JP 2001511445 A 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/07 A

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/38 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/335 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/385 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/39 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/19 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 41/00 B

2004-03-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF SELECTIVE RXR AGONISTS TO PREVENT SURGICAL ADHESIONS

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/07 A

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/38 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/335 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/385 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/39 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/19 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 41/00 B

2004-03-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF SELECTIVE RXR AGONISTS TO PREVENT SURGICAL ADHESIONS

2002-03-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020208

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/07 A, 7A 61K 31/38 B, 7A 61K 31/335 B, 7A 61K 31/385 B, 7A 61K 31/39 B, 7A 61K 31/19 B

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE