Global Patent Index - EP 1003604 A1

EP 1003604 A1 2000-05-31 - DEVICE FOR DISPERSING A GAS IN A LIQUID TO CARRY OUT CHEMICAL, BIOCHEMICAL REACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT SUSPENDED PARTICLES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DISPERSING A GAS IN A LIQUID TO CARRY OUT CHEMICAL, BIOCHEMICAL REACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT SUSPENDED PARTICLES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINBRINGEN EINES GASES IN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG CHEMISCHER ODER BIOCHEMISCHER REAKTIONEN MIT ODER OHNE SUSPENSIONSPARTIKELN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR DISPERSER UN GAZ DANS UN LIQUIDE EN VUE D'EFFECTUER DES REACTIONS CHIMIQUES, BIOCHIMIQUES AVEC OU SANS PARTICULES EN SUSPENSION

Publication

EP 1003604 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99911885 A

Priority

  • FR 9900793 W
  • FR 9804597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776942A1] The invention concerns a device for dispersing a gas in a liquid to carry out chemical, biochemical reactions or simple physical exchanges with or without suspended particles. The dispersing device consists of an orifice (do) emitting a vertical liquid jet directed downwards, a tube (Do) coaxial with the jet, and an impact plate P. The orifice (do) is located near the dispersion level, maintained constant (overflow N). The jet sucks up the gas G, the carrier in the tube (Do), with the dispersion which has been allowed to penetrate into said tube (Do) in its upper part (holes phi immersed in the dispersion) and disperses the whole by impact on the plate P. No bubble reaches the volume located below the plate P. Said device is capable of replacing the gas distributor in bubble columns, the dispenser and the stirrer of stirred tanks. It can be used for aerating purification waste water tanks. The resulting contactors are much more efficient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/04; B01F 5/02; B01F 5/10; B01J 10/00; B01J 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B01F 5/02 (2006.01); B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B01F 5/10 (2006.01); B01F 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/0268 (2013.01); B01F 3/0876 (2013.01); B01F 5/0212 (2013.01); B01F 3/04099 (2013.01); B01F 5/10 (2013.01); B01F 2013/1091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951331A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776942 A1 19991008; FR 2776942 B1 20000505; DE 69909217 D1 20030807; EP 1003604 A1 20000531; EP 1003604 B1 20030702; WO 9951331 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOTTON ROGER

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOTTON ROGER

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-10-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909217 P 20030807

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-07-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-07-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2001-12-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SYSTEM FOR DISPERSING A GAS IN A LIQUID TO CARRY OUT CHEMICAL, BIOCHEMICAL REACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT SUSPENDED PARTICLES

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991228

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL