Global Patent Index - EP 1003616 A1

EP 1003616 A1 2000-05-31 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FORMING, IN PARTICULAR COLD-FORMING, WORKPIECES

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FORMING, IN PARTICULAR COLD-FORMING, WORKPIECES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERFORMEN, INSBESONDERE ZUM KALTVERFORMEN, VON WERKSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE FORMAGE, NOTAMMENT POUR LE FORMAGE A FROID, DE PIECES

Publication

EP 1003616 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943813 A

Priority

  • DE 19735486 A
  • EP 9804800 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908813A1] The invention relates to a device for cold-forming, in particular cold-heading a workpiece. The device has a forming die (3) and an automatic advance (5) which generates a relative movement between the workpiece (2) and the forming die (3). The invention is characterized in that the device (1, 1') has a frequency generating system (10) which cooperates with the automatic advance (5) and can modulate the relative movement between the workpiece (2) and the forming die (3) that is generated by the automatic advance (5). This modulation takes place in such a way that an advance, in which the workpiece (2) and/or the forming die (3) pass along a first stroke path in advance direction (P), can be followed by a return stroke in which the forming die (3) and/or of the workpiece (2) move along a second stroke path in a direction opposite to advance direction (P).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/18 (2006.01); B21C 23/00 (2006.01); B21C 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908813A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908813 A1 19990225; AT 220356 T 20020715; CA 2301037 A1 19990225; CA 2301037 C 20081021; DE 19735486 A1 19990318; DE 19735486 C2 20000720; EP 1003616 A1 20000531; EP 1003616 B1 20020710; ES 2179530 T3 20030116; JP 2001514969 A 20010918; JP 3572544 B2 20041006; KR 100406080 B1 20031117; US 6212929 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160826

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 220356 T

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-02-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59804736

- Representative's name: KOHLER SCHMID MOEBUS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCH, DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140625

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140701

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NOVAGRAAF SWITZERLAND SA;CHEMIN DE L'ECHO 3;1213 ONEX (CH)

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FELSS GMBH

- Free text: FELSS GMBH#DIESELSTRASSE 2#75203 KOENIGSBACH-STEIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FELSS GMBH#DIESELSTRASSE 2#75203 KOENIGSBACH-STEIN (DE)

2003-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179530 T3

2002-12-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2002-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804736 20020814

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-07-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220356 T 20020715

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FEISS GMBH

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010719

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991211

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI