Global Patent Index - EP 1003634 A1

EP 1003634 A1 2000-05-31 - SAFETY LOCKING ARRANGEMENT FOR MECHANICAL PRESSES

Title (en)

SAFETY LOCKING ARRANGEMENT FOR MECHANICAL PRESSES

Title (de)

VERRIEGELUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR MECHANISCHE PRESSEN

Title (fr)

DISOSITIF DE BLOCAGE POUR PRESSES MECANIQUES

Publication

EP 1003634 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99926743 A

Priority

  • IT 9900168 W
  • IT MC980062 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964226A1] The present invention relates to an emergency brake for mechanical presses, capable of blocking the mobile organs of the press in all stop positions, as well as deactivating the start controls of the press, as long as it is inserted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 15/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/287 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964226A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964226 A1 19991216; AU 4390399 A 19991230; EP 1003634 A1 20000531; IT MC980062 A1 19991213; IT MC980062 D0 19980612

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060823

2006-04-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SAFETY LOCKING ARRANGEMENT FOR MECHANICAL PRESSES

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PAOLINI, GIUSEPPE

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CIPRIANI, RENZO

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PAOLINI, GIUSEPPE

2001-05-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE