Global Patent Index - EP 1003642 A1

EP 1003642 A1 2000-05-31 - INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING SHEET-SHAPED PRINTED ARTICLES

Title (en)

INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING SHEET-SHAPED PRINTED ARTICLES

Title (de)

ANLAGE ZUM ERSTELLEN BLATTARTIGER DRUCKERZEUGNISSE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ARTICLES IMPRIMES EN FORME DE FEUILLES

Publication

EP 1003642 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946300 A

Priority

  • DE 19735070 A
  • EP 9805016 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735070A1] The system includes an input station (6) from which sheets are fed an output station (7) using suction type conveyor belts (4,5). The sheets are proceed at a controlled rate and pass a number of ink jet printing units (27). The printing units are followed by drying units (32,33). The transfer onto the first feed belt is made by a single sheet feed handling unit (36) that is synchronised with the speed of the belt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/60 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/0085 (2013.01); B41J 3/60 (2013.01); B41J 11/002 (2013.01); B41J 11/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908878A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735070 A1 19990218; DE 19735070 C2 20010906; AU 9340498 A 19990308; EP 1003642 A1 20000531; EP 1003642 B1 20020116; ES 2172199 T3 20020916; US 6471430 B1 20021029; WO 9908878 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150808

2016-09-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160926

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100807

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172199

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020415

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802651

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADVANCED PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INDUSTRIESERVIS GESELLSCHAFT FUER INNOVATION TECHN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GAUS, RAINER

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BACH, GERHARD

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BAER, KAI, K.O.

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT