Global Patent Index - EP 1003646 A1

EP 1003646 A1 2000-05-31 - VALUE AND SECURITY PRODUCT WITH A LUMINESCENT ELEMENT

Title (en)

VALUE AND SECURITY PRODUCT WITH A LUMINESCENT ELEMENT

Title (de)

WERT- UND SICHERHEITSERZEUGNIS MIT LUMINESZENZELEMENT

Title (fr)

PRODUIT DE VALEUR ET DE SECURITE A ELEMENT LUMINESCENT

Publication

EP 1003646 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943829 A

Priority

  • DE 19735293 A
  • EP 9804837 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735293A1] The banknote or other security document has a paper substrate (1) into which an electrode arrangement (2) is formed. The electrode arrangement reacts to an electro magnetic field. The electrodes extend (6,7) and are located in a checking unit (8). A section of the surface has an electro luminescent layer (13) that is illuminated by an externally applied background lighting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01); B42D 25/29 (2014.01); G07D 7/00 (2006.01); H01S 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/29 (2014.10)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908881A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735293 A1 19990218; DE 19735293 C2 20030612; AT 251998 T 20031115; AT 400446 T 20080715; CA 2300971 A1 19990225; CN 1105654 C 20030416; CN 1271310 A 20001025; CO 4790195 A1 19990531; CZ 20000520 A3 20001213; CZ 295125 B6 20050518; DE 59809934 D1 20031120; DE 59814253 D1 20080821; DK 1003646 T3 20040216; DK 1236584 T3 20081103; EP 1003646 A1 20000531; EP 1003646 B1 20031015; EP 1236584 A2 20020904; EP 1236584 A3 20040107; EP 1236584 B1 20080709; ES 2209202 T3 20040616; ES 2309121 T3 20081216; HU 0003606 A2 20010228; HU 0003606 A3 20021228; IL 134414 D0 20010430; JP 2001514986 A 20010918; JP 4554070 B2 20100929; PE 104099 A1 19991105; PL 193977 B1 20070430; PL 339308 A1 20001204; PT 1003646 E 20040331; PT 1236584 E 20080903; WO 9908881 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-03-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031210

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209202 T3

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-02-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040400023

2004-02-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809934 P 20031120

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE KLOCKE SPAETH BARTH

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000129

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE