Global Patent Index - EP 1003657 A1

EP 1003657 A1 2000-05-31 - ABS MODULATOR SOLENOID WITH A PRESSURE BALANCING PISTON

Title (en)

ABS MODULATOR SOLENOID WITH A PRESSURE BALANCING PISTON

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETVENTIL MIT DRUCKAUSGLEICHSKOLBEN FÜR EINEN ABS-MODULATOR

Title (fr)

SOLENOIDE DE MODULATEUR ABS AVEC PISTON D'EQUILIBRAGE DE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1003657 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942183 A

Priority

  • US 9817348 W
  • US 91707397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910213A1] An ABS modulator solenoid valve (10), having one electric solenoid (12), in which the valve control piston (14) has a passage (16) therethrough for balancing the pneumatic pressure on both ends (34, 36) of the control piston (14). One end (34) of the piston (14) is disposed in a closed piston chamber (32) while the other end (36) is positioned to contact and position a valve spool (40). The passage (16) extends between the ends (34, 36) of the piston (14). Piston (14) is biased by a spring (50) to a position within the piston chamber (32). When the solenoid (12) is de-energized, the piston (14) remains in this position and variable air pressure, from an operator controlled brake valve (126), can be supplied through the valve (10) to a brake chamber (128) for operating the vehicle service brakes. During an ABS application, the solenoid (12) is energized to overcome the inlet spring (50) bias and the piston (14) moves into engagement with the valve spool (40). The spool (40) is biased by an exhaust spring (52) to a position wherein the exhaust port (24) is isolated from the supply port (20) and the delivery port (22). When the solenoid (12) is fully energized, the piston (14) engages the spool (40) and moves it to the exhaust position. When the solenoid is energized with a selected hold current, the piston (14) engages but does not move the spool (40) and the valve (10) is then in a hold position. Since the pressure on the ends (34, 36) of the piston (14) is balanced, the force required to move the piston (14) to the hold position is relatively constant and not greatly effected by the pneumatic pressure at the supply port (20) or the delivery port (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 8/36; B60T 13/68; F15B 13/044; F16K 31/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/36 (2006.01); B60T 13/68 (2006.01); B60T 15/02 (2006.01); F15B 13/044 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01); G03G 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/362 (2013.01); B60T 8/367 (2013.01); B60T 15/027 (2013.01); F15B 13/044 (2013.01); Y10T 137/86919 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87217 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910213A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910213 A1 19990304; CA 2300897 A1 19990304; CA 2300897 C 20080415; EP 1003657 A1 20000531; EP 1003657 B1 20050803; JP 2003525790 A 20030902; US 5979503 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-09-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051103

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-11-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-11-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69831081 P 20050908

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-08-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2003-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC

2003-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE