Global Patent Index - EP 1003680 A1

EP 1003680 A1 2000-05-31 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PACKAGING VISCOELASTIC MATERIALS

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PACKAGING VISCOELASTIC MATERIALS

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERPACKEN VON VISKOELASTISCHEN STOFFEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'EMBALLAGE DE MATERIAUX VISCOELASTIQUES

Publication

EP 1003680 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944432 A

Priority

  • US 9816467 W
  • US 5557597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9907618A1] A palletized load system for a viscoelastic material and a method for creating such a system by placing a tray (12) on a pallet (13), stacking polymeric, melt processable, film packages (11) of viscoelastic material on the tray and applying a stetchwrap (14) about the periphery of the pallet, the tray and the bags, said wrap overlying and extending down the side supports (13b) of the pallet at least 2,5 cm (one inch) from the edge of the upwardly facing surface of the pallet top (13a). The system inhibits cold flow of the viscoelastic material during shipping and storage and the film packages can be consumed in subsequent viscoelastic material processing operations, thus yielding a reliable, environment-friendly means for transporting and shipping viscoelastic materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/0096 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907618A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9907618 A1 19990218; AU 9197098 A 19990301; DE 69804809 D1 20020516; DE 69804809 T2 20021114; EP 1003680 A1 20000531; EP 1003680 B1 20020410

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-03-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-08-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020807

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804809 20020516

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000128

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB