Global Patent Index - EP 1003681 A1

EP 1003681 A1 2000-05-31 - TWO-COMPONENT CONTAINER

Title (en)

TWO-COMPONENT CONTAINER

Title (de)

ZWEIKOMPONENTENBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

RESERVOIR A DEUX COMPOSANTES

Publication

EP 1003681 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907441 A

Priority

  • DE 19812660 A
  • EP 9900547 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812660A1] The invention relates to a two-component container (1). According to the invention, two chambers (6, 7) can be connected by expelling a stopper (5). The stopper (5) can be pushed out of the element (14) holding it in place by screwing one container (3) into a thread (4) which is connected to another container (2). An intermediate piece (19) is provided between the two containers (2, 3). Said intermediate piece (19) rests on the upper edge (21) of the lower container (3) with a support (20). A sealing lip (30) between the connecting piece (10) and the intermediate piece (19) can be elastically, outwardly set back so as to produce a valve effect with excess pressure in the two-component container (1). The inventive two-component container (1) is suitable for storing peroxide and hair colorant separately.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3211 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948772A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812660 A1 19990930; BR 9904883 A 20000919; EP 1003681 A1 20000531; EP 1003681 B1 20020904; JP 2002500605 A 20020108; JP 3934683 B2 20070620; US 6126032 A 20001003; WO 9948772 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090128

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902536

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-10

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-04-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990827

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT