Global Patent Index - EP 1003681 B1

EP 1003681 B1 2002-09-04 - TWO-COMPONENT CONTAINER

Title (en)

TWO-COMPONENT CONTAINER

Title (de)

ZWEIKOMPONENTENBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

RESERVOIR A DEUX COMPOSANTES

Publication

EP 1003681 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907441 A

Priority

  • DE 19812660 A
  • EP 9900547 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812660A1] The invention relates to a two-component container (1). According to the invention, two chambers (6, 7) can be connected by expelling a stopper (5). The stopper (5) can be pushed out of the element (14) holding it in place by screwing one container (3) into a thread (4) which is connected to another container (2). An intermediate piece (19) is provided between the two containers (2, 3). Said intermediate piece (19) rests on the upper edge (21) of the lower container (3) with a support (20). A sealing lip (30) between the connecting piece (10) and the intermediate piece (19) can be elastically, outwardly set back so as to produce a valve effect with excess pressure in the two-component container (1). The inventive two-component container (1) is suitable for storing peroxide and hair colorant separately.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3211 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812660 A1 19990930; BR 9904883 A 20000919; EP 1003681 A1 20000531; EP 1003681 B1 20020904; JP 2002500605 A 20020108; JP 3934683 B2 20070620; US 6126032 A 20001003; WO 9948772 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090128

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902536 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-04-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990827

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT