Global Patent Index - EP 1003684 A1

EP 1003684 A1 2000-05-31 - FEEDING MACHINE

Title (en)

FEEDING MACHINE

Title (de)

BESCHICKUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION

Publication

EP 1003684 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948830 A

Priority

  • DE 19735382 A
  • EP 9805131 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735382A1] Feed device for output of things like envelopes which come in as stack has downwards sloping supply channel, another channel going upwards at angle from this, two delivery band units, stripper, etc.. A feed device for the output of flat flexible objects which are input in stacks, especially of envelopes, into a station for further individual manipulation has: a downwards sloping supply channel (1) to accommodate the stack of goods; a channel (4) going obliquely upwards from the lower end of the supply channel, on whose base (6) the delivery bands (9) of a first delivery band unit (10) "having upper fragments from increased friction to the goods" run obliquely upwards and with a direction change then into another direction with minimal inclination, especially horizontally; a second delivery band unit (13) whose "lower fragments" from a region in front of the direction change up to a region above the first delivery band unit in the section of minimal inclination, stand directly opposite the "upper fragments" of the first delivery band unit; a stripper (21) which in the second-mentioned channel reaches between two delivery bands of the first unit under the reg ion of the direction change in the direction of a counter-surface and serves to store the flow of elevated goods delivered from the stack; a removal device (30) which grasps the front edge of individual pieces of goods on the output side of the first and second units at certain distances from them and cyclically removes them; and a detector arrangement (38,39) which contains at least one detector responding to the arrival of the front edge of a piece of goods and depending on this, controls the operation of the removal device and/or the first and second units.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/04; B65H 1/02; B65H 3/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 59/06 (2006.01); B65H 1/00 (2006.01); B65H 3/04 (2006.01); B65H 3/34 (2006.01); B65H 3/52 (2006.01); B65H 5/02 (2006.01); B65H 5/24 (2006.01); B65H 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/023 (2013.01); B65H 1/00 (2013.01); B65H 3/34 (2013.01); B65H 5/025 (2013.01); B65H 5/24 (2013.01); B65H 29/66 (2013.01); B65H 2404/261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908951A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735382 A1 19990218; CA 2300183 A1 19990225; CA 2300183 C 20071030; EP 1003684 A1 20000531; EP 1003684 B1 20020320; JP 2001515002 A 20010918; US 6375182 B1 20020423; WO 9908951 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110812

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110812

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070817

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-05-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-02-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES DEUTSCHLAND GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-11-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-08-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020827

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803446

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI