Global Patent Index - EP 1003685 A1

EP 1003685 A1 2000-05-31 - METHOD FOR DIVIDING THE FLOW OF SIGNATURES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DIVIDING THE FLOW OF SIGNATURES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTEILEN EINES STROMES VON SIGNATUREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR PARTAGER UN COURANT DE SIGNATURES

Publication

EP 1003685 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948790 A

Priority

  • DE 9802338 W
  • DE 19735051 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735051A1] Conveyor belts (3,4) rest on the periphery of two opposite facing camshaft rollers (1,2). The signatures (6) are conveyed clamped between the conveyor belts. A guide wedge (13) with discharge edge (12) pointing towards the gap between the camshaft rollers is at least part positioned in the outlet gap of the camshaft rollers. The conveyor belts cross the discharge edge part of the guide wedge or cross the free space (43) between the separate wedges (40) forming the guide wedge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/54; B65H 29/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/60 (2006.01); B65H 29/12 (2006.01); B65H 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/12 (2013.01); B65H 29/58 (2013.01); B65H 2404/261 (2013.01); B65H 2404/632 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1932 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908952A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735051 A1 19990218; DE 19735051 C2 19990617; CN 1086175 C 20020612; CN 1273558 A 20001115; EP 1003685 A1 20000531; EP 1003685 B1 20011107; ES 2165702 T3 20020316; JP 2001515003 A 20010918; JP 3323487 B2 20020909; US 6321902 B1 20011127; WO 9908952 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070813

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070814

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070813

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070814

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070814

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070813

2008-04-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060811

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165702 T3

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020115

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802083 20011213

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE