Global Patent Index - EP 1003688 A1

EP 1003688 A1 2000-05-31 - SAFETY SUPPORT

Title (en)

SAFETY SUPPORT

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSSTEIGBÜGEL

Title (fr)

ETRIER DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1003688 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932033 A

Priority

  • DE 9801192 W
  • DE 19735211 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735211A1] The U shaped top part (22) has two side arms (24,26) and a top base part (28). Each of the two side arms has an articulated part (30) which has at least three pivot axles and two opposite facing connecting parts (32) joined by a connecting piece. The connecting parts each have a hole (38) for the pivot axle and each have a curved part bordered by two flat parts(37). Two adjacent link pins (40) are each joined by two connecting pieces (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B68C 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B68C 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B68C 3/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908957A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735211 A1 19990218; AT 211715 T 20020115; AU 731379 B2 20010329; AU 8208798 A 19990308; CA 2300089 A1 19990225; CA 2300089 C 20041207; DK 1003688 T3 20020429; EP 1003688 A1 20000531; EP 1003688 B1 20020109; ES 2172901 T3 20021001; JP 2001514951 A 20010918; US 6330781 B1 20011218; WO 9908957 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160429

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 211715 T

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-06-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MEROTH, IDA HF EN IMGENBERG, GABRIELE HF

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172901 T3

2002-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MEROTH, IDA HF EN IMGENBERG, GABRIELE HF

2002-04-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MEROTH, IDA HF

2002-03-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: IMGENBERG, GABRIELE HF

2002-03-20 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MEROTH, ERWIN

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802850 20020228

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-01-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211715 T 20020115

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-12-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SAFETY STIRRUP

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE