Global Patent Index - EP 1003694 A1

EP 1003694 A1 2000-05-31 - MINERAL FIBRE INSULATION

Title (en)

MINERAL FIBRE INSULATION

Title (de)

MINERALFASER FÜR ISOLATIONSZWECKE

Title (fr)

ISOLATION A FIBRE MINERALE

Publication

EP 1003694 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98936400 A

Priority

  • EP 9803979 W
  • GB 9717486 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908969A1] Pipe sections or external roof or wall cladding are formed of bonded man made vitreous fibre batts wherein the fibres have a viscosity at 1400 DEG C of 10 to 170 poise and a dissolution rate at pH 4.5 of at least 20nm per day.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03C 13/00; C03C 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/35 (2006.01); C03C 13/00 (2006.01); C03C 13/06 (2006.01); D01F 9/08 (2006.01); E04B 1/78 (2006.01); E04D 5/10 (2006.01); F16L 59/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 59/021 (2013.01); C03C 13/00 (2013.01); C03C 13/06 (2013.01); E04B 1/78 (2013.01); E04D 5/10 (2013.01); C03C 2213/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908969A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908969 A1 19990225; AU 8541398 A 19990308; CA 2301260 A1 19990225; CN 1267271 A 20000920; EP 1003694 A1 20000531; GB 9717486 D0 19971022; HR P980454 A2 19990430; HU 0004699 A2 20010428; HU 0004699 A3 20020228; JP 2001515006 A 20010918; PL 338833 A1 20001120; SK 1892000 A3 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021231

2001-08-01 [111L] LICENCES

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111L

- Free Format Text: 20010602 0100 ROCKWOOL ISOLATION S.A., SOCIETE ANONYME * 20010602 0200 ROCKFON SAS * 20010602 0300 ROCKWOOL ROCKPANEL B.V. * 20010602 0400 ROCKDELTA A/S * 20010602 0500 LAPINUS FIBRES B.V. * 20010602 0600 ROCKWOOL/GRODAN B.V.

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-07-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000208;LV PAYMENT 20000208;RO PAYMENT 20000208;SI PAYMENT 20000208