Global Patent Index - EP 1003740 A2

EP 1003740 A2 2000-05-31 - PYRROLIDINE-3-CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ENDOTHELIN ANTAGOISTS

Title (en)

PYRROLIDINE-3-CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ENDOTHELIN ANTAGOISTS

Title (de)

PYRROLIDIN-3-CARBONSÄURE DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ENDOTHELIN-ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES D'ENDOTHELINE

Publication

EP 1003740 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98937139 A

Priority

  • US 9815479 W
  • US 90591397 A
  • US 4895598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906397A2] A compound of formula (I), or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, is disclosed, as well as processes for and intermediates in the preparation thereof, and a method of antagonizing endothelin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 405/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 491/048 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/41 (2006.01); A61K 31/423 (2006.01); A61K 31/435 (2006.01); A61K 31/4355 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61K 31/535 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/08 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 9/14 (2006.01); A61P 13/08 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 21/00 (2006.01); A61P 21/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/06 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 207/16 (2006.01); C07D 207/27 (2006.01); C07D 403/04 (2006.01); C07D 405/00 (2006.01); C07D 405/04 (2006.01); C07D 405/14 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01); C07D 417/14 (2006.01); C07D 491/056 (2006.01); C07D 207/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 207/27 (2013.01); C07D 207/16 (2013.01); C07D 403/04 (2013.01); C07D 405/04 (2013.01); C07D 405/14 (2013.01); C07D 413/14 (2013.01); C07D 417/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906397A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906397 A2 19990211; WO 9906397 A3 19991209; AU 748469 B2 20020606; AU 8592198 A 19990222; BG 104216 A 20001229; BR 9815296 A 20011120; CA 2297894 A1 19990211; CN 1301264 A 20010627; EP 1003740 A2 20000531; HU 0003484 A2 20020128; HU 0003484 A3 20020228; IL 134175 D0 20010430; JP 2001512119 A 20010821; NO 20000542 A 20000404; NO 20000542 D0 20000202; NZ 502395 A 20020828; PL 342500 A1 20010604; SK 1452000 A3 20010510; TR 200000993 T2 20001221; TR 200101233 T2 20020621; TR 200101234 T2 20020621; TR 200501137 T2 20051221; TW 552260 B 20030911

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028397

2006-06-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060202

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020611

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WINN, MARTIN

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOYD, STEVEN, A.

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUTCHINS, CHARLES, W.

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JAE, HWAN-SOO

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TASKER, ANDREW, S.

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VON GELDERN, THOMAS, W.

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KESTER, JEFFREY, A.

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SORENSEN, BRYAN, K.

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000222

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000222;SI PAYMENT 20000222