Global Patent Index - EP 1003751 A1

EP 1003751 A1 2000-05-31 - HYDROXAMIC ACID SUBSTITUTED FUSED HETEROCYCLIC METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

HYDROXAMIC ACID SUBSTITUTED FUSED HETEROCYCLIC METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

HYDROXAMSÄURE SUBSTITUIERTE KONDENSIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE METALLOPROTEASES HETEROCYCLIQUES HYBRIDES ET SUBSTITUES PAR DE L'ACIDE HYDROXAMIQUE

Publication

EP 1003751 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939182 A

Priority

  • US 9816147 W
  • US 5475397 P
  • US 12851298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906410A1] Selected novel hydroxamic acid substituted fused heterocyclic compounds of formula (I) are effective for prophylaxis and treatment of inflammation, tissue degradation and related diseases. The invention encompasses novel compounds, analogs, prodrugs and pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof, pharmaceutical compositions and methods for prophylaxis and treatment of inflammation, tissue degradation and related diseases. The subject invention also relates to processes for making such compounds as well as to intermediates useful in such processes (I).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 495/04; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/55; C07D 491/048; C07D 498/04; C07D 513/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4365 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); C07D 491/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/048 (2006.01); C07D 495/04 (2006.01); C07D 498/04 (2006.01); C07D 513/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 491/04 (2013.01); C07D 495/04 (2013.01); C07D 513/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906410A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906410 A1 19990211; AU 8766498 A 19990222; CA 2297988 A1 19990211; EP 1003751 A1 20000531; JP 2003524572 A 20030819

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-13 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1024479

2003-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020430

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMGEN INC.

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THOMSON, DAVID, S.

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOCH, KEVIN

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HWANG, CHAN, KOU

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RUSSO-RODRIGUEZ, SANDRA, E.

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUMMEL, CONRAD

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000126;LT PAYMENT 20000126;LV PAYMENT 20000126;MK PAYMENT 20000126;RO PAYMENT 20000126;SI PAYMENT 20000126