Global Patent Index - EP 1003768 A1

EP 1003768 A1 2000-05-31 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (en)

SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (de)

ABGESONDERTE PROTEINE UND SIE KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE

Title (fr)

PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES LES CODANT

Publication

EP 1003768 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98926539 A

Priority

  • US 9812076 W
  • US 8623497 P
  • US 9628798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2293825A1] Novel polynucteotides and the proteins encoded thereby are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; A61K 38/00; C07K 14/00; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

CA 2293825 A1 19981217; EP 1003768 A1 20000531; EP 1003768 A4 20021030; JP 2002514089 A 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-10-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07H 21/04 A, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12N 1/21 B, 7C 12N 15/00 B, 7A 61K 38/00 B

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENETICS INSTITUTE, LLC

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JACOBS, KENNETH

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCCOY, JOHN, M.

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAVALLIE, EDWARD, R.

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RACIE, LISA, A.

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TREACY, MAURICE

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPAULDING, VIKKI

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AGOSTINO, MICHAEL, J.

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOWES, STEVEN, H.

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE