Global Patent Index - EP 1003846 A4

EP 1003846 A4 2002-11-13 - PROTEASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

PROTEASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

PROTEASEINHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE PROTEASES

Publication

EP 1003846 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98923299 A

Priority

  • US 9803200 W
  • US 4575897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850533A1] The invention relates to 3-hydroxy- and 3-keto-cyclohetero-substituted leucine compounds that are inhibitors of cysteine proteases, particularly cathepsin K, and are useful in the treatment of diseases in which inhibition of bone loss is a factor. The 3-hydroxy- or 3-keto-moiety is bonded to a tetrahydrothiophene, tetrahydrothiopyran, tetrahydrofuran or tetrahydropyran ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/99; A01N 43/02; A01N 43/06; A01N 43/08; A01N 43/16; A01N 43/18; A61K 31/34; A61K 31/35; A61K 31/38; A61K 31/40; A61K 31/415; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/445; A61K 31/47; A61K 31/495; A61P 21/06; C07D 307/22; C07D 309/14; C07D 405/12; C07D 407/12; C07D 409/12; C07D 495/04; C12N 9/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/99 (2006.01); A61K 31/341 (2006.01); A61K 31/351 (2006.01); A61K 31/36 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61P 1/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); C07D 307/22 (2006.01); C07D 307/32 (2006.01); C07D 307/33 (2006.01); C07D 307/83 (2006.01); C07D 307/86 (2006.01); C07D 309/30 (2006.01); C07D 333/36 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 407/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 307/32 (2013.01); C07D 307/22 (2013.01); C07D 307/83 (2013.01); C07D 307/86 (2013.01); C07D 309/30 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01); C07D 407/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PY] WO 9716177 A1 19970509 - SMITH WARD WHITLOCK JR [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0525420 A1 19930203 - MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]
  • [A] EP 0623627 A1 19941109 - MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]
  • [A] EP 0543310 A2 19930526 - SUNTORY LTD [JP]
  • [A] EP 0611756 A2 19940824 - TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]
  • [A] EP 0603873 A1 19940629 - MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]
  • [T] R. W. MARQUIS ET AL.: "Cyclic ketone inhibitors of the cysteine protease Cathepsin K", J. MED. CHEM., vol. 44, 2001, pages 725 - 736, XP002211174
  • [PY] J. L. CONROY: "Using the electrostatic field effect to design a new class of inhibitors for cysteine proteases", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 119, 7 May 1997 (1997-05-07), pages 4285 - 4291, XP002211175
  • [PY] J. L. CONROY: "Synthesis of cyclohexanone-based Cathepsin B inhibitors that interact with both the S and S' binding sites", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 39, 5 November 1998 (1998-11-05), pages 8253 - 8256, XP002211176
  • See also references of WO 9850533A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850533 A1 19981112; AR 013079 A1 20001213; AU 7562598 A 19981127; BR 9809306 A 20000704; CA 2288868 A1 19981112; CN 1255161 A 20000531; CO 4950618 A1 20000901; EP 1003846 A1 20000531; EP 1003846 A4 20021113; HU 0002247 A2 20010528; HU 0002247 A3 20030128; IL 132088 D0 20010319; JP 2001525804 A 20011211; KR 20010012256 A 20010215; NO 995434 A 19991105; NO 995434 D0 19991105; NZ 337889 A 20010928; PE 71599 A1 19990915; PL 336856 A1 20000717; TR 199902766 T2 20000221; ZA 9803762 B 19981106

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028786

2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-11-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 9/99 A, 7C 12N 9/50 B, 7A 01N 43/02 B, 7A 01N 43/06 B, 7A 01N 43/08 B, 7A 01N 43/16 B, 7A 01N 43/18 B, 7A 61P 21/06 B, 7C 07D 407/12 B, 7C 07D 405/12 B, 7C 07D 409/12 B, 7C 07D 495/04 B, 7C 07D 309/14 B, 7C 07D 307/22 B, 7A 61K 31/34 B, 7A 61K 31/47 B, 7A 61K 31/44 B, 7A 61K 31/38 B, 7A 61K 31/445 B, 7A 61K 31/495 B, 7A 61K 31/415 B, 7A 61K 31/35 B, 7A 61K 31/40 B

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2000-12-20 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2000-12-20 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19991206