Global Patent Index - EP 1003895 A2

EP 1003895 A2 2000-05-31 - CLONING VECTORS FOR PRODUCING ADENOVIRAL MINIMAL VIRUSES

Title (en)

CLONING VECTORS FOR PRODUCING ADENOVIRAL MINIMAL VIRUSES

Title (de)

KLONIERUNGSVEKTOREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ADENOVIRALEN MINIMALVIREN

Title (fr)

VECTEURS DE CLONAGE POUR PREPARER DES ADENOVIRUS DE TYPE VIRUS MINIMAUX

Publication

EP 1003895 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98944984 A

Priority

  • DE 9801940 W
  • DE 19729571 A
  • DE 19744768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902647A2] The invention relates to cloning vectors for producing adenoviral minimal viruses, consisting of: a) two adenoviral, inverted terminal replication sequences (ITR, inverted terminal repeats) which are flanked by ab) two interfaces for a restriction endonuclease with a recognition sequence more than 8 Bp in length, and enclose ac) an adenoviral packaging signal, ad) a multiple cloning site for inserting therapeutic DNA fragments into which non-coding chromosomal mammal DNA is possibly cloned in addition, ae) possibly a recognition site for a recombinase situated between one of the inverted terminal replication sequences and the adenoviral packaging signal, and af) possibly a reporter gene cassette; b) a bacterial plasmid backbone with replication origin and bacterial resistance gene, into which ba) a packaging signal of a bacteriophage is cloned.

[origin: WO9902647A2] Die Erfindung betrifft Klonierungsvektoren für die Herstellung von Adenoviralen Minimalviren, bestehend aus a) zwei adenoviralen terminalen invertierten Replikationssequenzen (ITR, inverted terminal repeats), die von ab) zwei Schnittstellen für eine Restriktionsendonuklease mit einer länger als 8 Bp langen Erkennungssequenz flankiert werden, und ac) ein adenovirales Verpackungssignal, ad) eine Multiple Klonierungsstelle zur Insertion von therapeutischen DNA-Fragmenten, in welche ggf. zusätzlich nichtkodierende chromosomale Säugetier-DNA einkloniert ist, sowie ae) ggf. eine Erkennungsstelle für eine Rekombinase, die zwischen einer der invertierten terminalen Replikationssequenzen und dem adenoviralen Verpackungssignal liegt, af) ggf. eine Reportergenkassette umrahmen, sowie b) einem bakteriellen Plasmidrückgrat mit Replikationsursprung und bakteriellem Resistenzgen, in das ba) ein Verpackungssignal eines Bakteriophagen einkloniert ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/86 (2006.01); A61K 47/30 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/861 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10343 (2013.01); C12N 2800/30 (2013.01); C12N 2800/80 (2013.01); C12N 2830/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902647A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902647 A2 19990121; WO 9902647 A3 19990415; EP 1003895 A2 20000531; JP 2001509375 A 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091021

2009-06-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/86 20060101AFI20090514BHEP

2009-06-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/861 20060101ALI20090514BHEP

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031006

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEVELOGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FUER ENTWICKLUNGSBIOL

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE