Global Patent Index - EP 1003896 A1

EP 1003896 A1 2000-05-31 - COAT-PROTEIN-MODIFIED BACULOVIRUS VECTOR FOR GENE THERAPY

Title (en)

COAT-PROTEIN-MODIFIED BACULOVIRUS VECTOR FOR GENE THERAPY

Title (de)

HÜLLPROTEIN-MODIFIZIERTER BACULOVIRUS-VEKTOR FÜR DIE GENTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

VECTEUR DE BACULOVIRUS MODIFIE PAR COQUE DE PROTEINE S'UTILISANT EN GENOTHERAPIE

Publication

EP 1003896 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98947386 A

Priority

  • DE 9802255 W
  • DE 19735593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735593A1] Vector for gene therapy comprising a baculovirus with a modified envelope protein, containing a therapeutic DNA sequence, a promoter for expression in mammalian cells, and optionally an "establishing" sequence is new.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/86; A61K 48/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 15/866 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); C07K 14/70596 (2013.01); C12N 2710/14143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909193A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735593 A1 19990218; DE 19735593 C2 19990826; CA 2300362 A1 19990225; EP 1003896 A1 20000531; ES 2150894 T1 20001216; JP 2003530064 A 20031014; WO 9909193 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040229

2001-08-08 [IECL] IE: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

2001-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEVELOGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FUER ENTWICKLUNGSBIOL

2000-12-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150894 T1

2000-11-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2000-09-15 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-09-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE