Global Patent Index - EP 1003897 A1

EP 1003897 A1 2000-05-31 - COMPLEXES FOR TRANSPORTING NUCLEIC ACID INTO EUKARYOTIC HIGHER-CELLS

Title (en)

COMPLEXES FOR TRANSPORTING NUCLEIC ACID INTO EUKARYOTIC HIGHER-CELLS

Title (de)

KOMPLEXE FÜR DEN TRANSPORT VON NUKLEINSÄURE IN HÖHERE EUKARYOTISCHE ZELLEN

Title (fr)

COMPLEXES POUR LE TRANSPORT D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE DANS DES CELLULES EUCARYOTES SUPERIEURES

Publication

EP 1003897 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98933632 A

Priority

  • DE 19726186 A
  • EP 9803679 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726186A1] The invention relates to complexes consisting of nucleic acid and polyethylene imine (PEI) in which the PEI is modified by means of hydrophilic polymers, such as polyethylene glycol, linked to the PEI by a covalent bond, and to a method for producing said complexes. A cellular ligand such as transferring is possibly bound to the PEI. The complexes can be used for producing pharmaceutical compounds for the transfer of therapeutically active genes in mammalian cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/87; A61K 31/70; C07K 14/485; C07K 14/52; C07K 14/79; C12N 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61M 36/14 (2006.01); C08G 73/04 (2006.01); C08G 81/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/87 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48215 (2013.01); A61K 47/48192 (2013.01); C08G 81/00 (2013.01); C12N 15/87 (2013.01); C12N 2310/351 (2013.01); C12N 2310/3513 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859064A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726186 A1 19981224; AU 8338598 A 19990104; CA 2294611 A1 19981230; EP 1003897 A1 20000531; JP 2002506441 A 20020226; US 2001005717 A1 20010628; US 2004248842 A1 20041209; WO 9859064 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041019

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, ERNST

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OGRIS, MANFRED

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIRCHEIS, RALF

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRUNNER, SYLVIA

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE