Global Patent Index - EP 1003905 A1

EP 1003905 A1 2000-05-31 - ELECTROCHEMICAL REPORTER SYSTEM FOR DETECTING ANALYTICAL IMMUNOASSAY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY PROCEDURES

Title (en)

ELECTROCHEMICAL REPORTER SYSTEM FOR DETECTING ANALYTICAL IMMUNOASSAY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY PROCEDURES

Title (de)

ELEKTROCHEMISCHES SYSTEM ZUR DETEKTION VON IMMUNOASSAY UND MOLEKULARBIOLOGIE PROZEDUREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME REPORTEUR ELECTROCHIMIQUE PERMETTANT DE DETECTER LES DOSAGES IMMUNOLOGIQUES ANALYTIQUES ET PROCEDURES DE BIOLOGIE MOLECULAIRE

Publication

EP 1003905 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98940857 A

Priority

  • US 9816714 W
  • US 5546697 P
  • US 5575997 P
  • US 10553898 A
  • US 10553998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9907879A1] An immunochemical and molecular biologic endpoint reporter system in which reaction products, coupled to electrochemically active molecules susceptible to redox recycling or coupled to enzymes capable of proportional generation of said electrochemically active molecules, are detected and/or quantitated using amperiometry in conjunction with a silicon microship possessing a closely spaced interdigitated array of nobel metal electrodes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/00; C12Q 1/34; C12Q 1/42; C12Q 1/44; C12Q 1/68; G01N 27/327; G01N 33/543

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12M 1/34 (2006.01); C12Q 1/00 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 27/327 (2006.01); G01N 27/403 (2006.01); G01N 27/416 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/005 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6825 (2013.01); G01N 27/3277 (2013.01); G01N 33/5438 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907879A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9907879 A1 19990218; AU 8903998 A 19990301; CA 2300268 A1 19990218; EP 1003905 A1 20000531; JP 2001512691 A 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050224

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2003-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

2003-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZURFOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAND

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE