Global Patent Index - EP 1003920 B1

EP 1003920 B1 2001-12-05 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HIGH-STRENGTH TRACK ELEMENT AND TRACK ELEMENT THUS OBTAINED

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HIGH-STRENGTH TRACK ELEMENT AND TRACK ELEMENT THUS OBTAINED

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHFESTEN GLEISTEILS SOWIE GLEISTEIL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT DE VOIE A RESISTANCE ELEVEE, ET ELEMENT DE VOIE AINSI OBTENU

Publication

EP 1003920 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943853 A

Priority

  • DE 19735285 A
  • EP 9804894 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735285A1] A high strength rail part is made of a steel with a bainitic structure, which has the composition 0.3-0.6% C, 0.8-1.5% Si, 0.7-1.0% Mn, 0.9-1.4% Cr, 0.6-1.0% Mo, balance Fe and impurities. The steel has strength \-1400 N/mm<2> and elastic limit \-1100 N/mm<2>. An Independent claim is also included for production of a steel rail part by heating to 750-920 deg C, cooling to 250-450 deg C, reheating at 400-560 deg C for 60-150 mins. and cooling to room temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/04; C21D 1/20; C22C 38/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/20 (2006.01); C21D 9/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/22 (2006.01); E01B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/00 (2013.01); C21D 1/20 (2013.01); C21D 9/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C21D 2211/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735285 A1 19990218; DE 19735285 C2 20010823; AT 210197 T 20011215; AU 736649 B2 20010802; AU 9159598 A 19990308; DK 1003920 T3 20020402; EP 1003920 A1 20000531; EP 1003920 B1 20011205; ES 2169547 T3 20020701; NO 20000707 A 20000211; NO 20000707 D0 20000211; PL 189758 B1 20050930; PL 338544 A1 20001106; PT 1003920 E 20020531; US 6315844 B1 20011113; WO 9909222 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59802362

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070807

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070807

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080206

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070807

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-04-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-04-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BWG G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-02-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080206

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060814

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060817

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060816

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060815

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060815

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-14 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060814

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-10 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060810

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-24 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169547 T3

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BWG GMBH & CO. KG

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802362 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BWG GMBH & CO. KG

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210197 T 20011215

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE