Global Patent Index - EP 1003936 A1

EP 1003936 A1 2000-05-31 - DEVICE FOR THE LAYING OF A TRAVERSABLE TEMPORARY ROADWAY SYSTEM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR THE LAYING OF A TRAVERSABLE TEMPORARY ROADWAY SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERLEGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR NOTPISTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF SERVANT A POSER UN SYSTEME ROUTIER TEMPORAIRE ET PRATICABLE

Publication

EP 1003936 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98945219 A

Priority

  • DE 19735417 A
  • EP 9805107 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735417A1] A temporary roadway is made of a number of rigid laths joined into a flexible mat reeled onto a horizontal axle. A support frame carries the roll and is loaded onto a truck. The roll is carried with its axis parallel to the vehicle axis, for a transport setting, and is swung through right angles to hold the roll ready to unreel the roadway. The support frame can be transferred between the ground and the truck by the loading arms of the truck.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/522 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909255A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735417 A1 19990218; AU 9261098 A 19990308; EP 1003936 A1 20000531; EP 1003936 B1 20020206; WO 9909255 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150903 AND 20150909

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020820

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803777 20020321

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: VEHICLE FOR THE LAYING OF A TRAVERSABLE TEMPORARY ROADWAY SYSTEM

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT