Global Patent Index - EP 1003939 A1

EP 1003939 A1 2000-05-31 - HYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE FOR A MOBILE MACHINE, ESPECIALLY FOR A WHEEL LOADER

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE FOR A MOBILE MACHINE, ESPECIALLY FOR A WHEEL LOADER

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHE STEUERANORDNUNG FÜR EINE MOBILE ARBEITSMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN RADLADER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE DESTINE A UNE MACHINE DE TRAVAIL MOBILE, NOTAMMENT A UNE CHARGEUSE A ROUES

Publication

EP 1003939 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945142 A

Priority

  • DE 19734658 A
  • EP 9804848 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734658A1] The invention relates to a hydraulic control device for a mobile machine, especially for a wheel loader, comprising at least one hydraulic cylinder for moving the machine, a directional control valve for controlling the pressure medium channels between a pressure chamber of the hydraulic cylinder, a pressure medium source and a tank, a hydraulic accumulator which can be connected to the pressure medium source by a filling line, and a control valve. A connection between the hydraulic accumulator and the pressure chamber of the hydraulic cylinder can be opened and closed by means of said control valve. The aim of the invention is provide a hydraulic control device of this type with an added means of preventing the machine from falling down. To this end, a deblockable locking valve is provided upstream from the pressure chamber of the hydraulic cylinder, opening out into the pressure chamber. Said locking valve can be opened when the directional control valve is activated for the pressure medium to flow out of the pressure chamber to the tank, and when the control valve is activated to create a fluidic connection between the pressure chamber and the hydraulic accumulator. This enables the pressure chamber in the hydraulic cylinder to be blocked off whilst ensuring its connection with the hydraulic accumulator in order to dampen pitching oscillations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/43 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/2217 (2013.01); E02F 9/2207 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907950A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734658 A1 19990218; EP 1003939 A1 20000531; EP 1003939 B1 20020515; JP 2001512797 A 20010828; US 6370874 B1 20020416; WO 9907950 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130804

2014-06-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59804150

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130804

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130805

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130804

2014-04-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-12-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804150

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-20

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010713

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000115

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE