Global Patent Index - EP 1003944 A1

EP 1003944 A1 2000-05-31 - DEVICE FOR CLEARING DEBRIS FROM GUTTERS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CLEARING DEBRIS FROM GUTTERS

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM ABRÄUMEN VON DACHRINNENSCHMUTZ

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR DEBLAYER LES DEBRIS DANS LES GOUTTIERES

Publication

EP 1003944 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928502 A

Priority

  • IE 9800044 W
  • IE S970433 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857006A1] A device for clearing accumulated debris from eave-level rainwater gutters on buildings, comprising a travelling member (3) adapted to be positioned on or in the gutter with sufficient clearance below the overhanging edge of the roof cover for placement, operation and subsequent removal of said member, a substantially rigid longitudinal handle (7) for moving said member to and fro longitudinally of the gutter, for manipulation by a person working below the gutter, for example at ground level or on a balcony intermediate the ground level and the gutter being cleared. Optionally the handle is extensible and contractible, for example telescopically, to allow for clearing gutters at different heights. The device also includes means associated with the travelling member for dislodging any debris and forwarding it to the downpipe for disposal. The dislodging means comprises a water conduit (2) terminating in a directional nozzle (4) mounted on the travelling member, and means for supplying water to said conduit at high pressure to produce a jet effective to dislodge the debris; optionally the dislodging means is complemented by a sweeping block mounted on the travelling member to occupy a cross-sectional region of the gutter upstream of the jet for sweeping the dislodged debris in one direction of travel of the travelling member; optional a powered pump (5) is used to produce water at high pressure and optionally a closed circuit television unit is used to monitor progress in clearance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/076

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/076 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/026 (2013.01); B05B 13/04 (2013.01); B05B 15/064 (2013.01); B08B 3/028 (2013.01); E04D 13/0765 (2013.01); B05B 9/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857006A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857006 A1 19981217; AT 262095 T 20040415; AU 8031798 A 19981230; DE 69822474 D1 20040422; EP 1003944 A1 20000531; EP 1003944 B1 20040317; IE S80742 B2 19990113; IE S970433 A2 19981216

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-03-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100611

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-12-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-03-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-02-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: LE BREVET A ETE RADIE PAR ERREUR. LE BREVET EST DE NOUVEAU EN VIGEUR.

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-11-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 20.08.2004

2004-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-06-18 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-06-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69822474

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE