Global patent index - EP 1003946 A1

EP 1003946 A1 2000-05-31 - SYSTEM FOR FIXING SUN PROTECTION CLOTH

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR FIXING SUN PROTECTION CLOTH

Title (de)

BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR SONNENSEGEL

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FIXATION POUR TOILE DE PROTECTION CONTRE LE SOLEIL

Publication

EP 1003946 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943701 A

Priority

  • DE 9801976 W
  • DE 19735190 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735190A1] The awning is fixed on two parallel guides (2,3) such as tension wires which are supported at the ends by tension holders (6,7) whereby the tension holders for the lower guide (2) are fixed as support arms to the balcony, balustrade or handrail by detachable clamping or screw connections so that they can swivel in a first plane at right angles to the longitudinal extension of the balustrade and/or in a second plane at right angles to the first.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/02 (2006.01); E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2013.01); E04F 10/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909273A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735190 A1 19990218; DE 19735190 B4 20060921; EP 1003946 A1 20000531; EP 1003946 B1 20021113; US 6510658 B1 20030128; WO 9909273 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59806287

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130329

2012-07-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59806287

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, GODEMEYER, KIERDORF & PARTNER, PATE, DE

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806287

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-19

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SYSTEM FOR FIXING SUN PROTECTION CLOTH

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR