Global Patent Index - EP 1003960 A2

EP 1003960 A2 2000-05-31 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1003960 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99919115 A

Priority

  • DE 9900873 W
  • DE 19813377 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813377A1] The invention relates to an internal combustion engine (1), especially for a motor vehicle. The internal combustion engine (1) is provided with an injection valve (8) by means of which fuel can be injected directly into a combustion chamber (4) either in a first operating mode during a compression stage or in a second operating mode during a suction stage. The invention also provides for a control device (16) for switching between the two operating modes and for carrying out a control and/or adjustment, differently for each operating mode, of the operating variables influencing the actual torque of the internal combustion engine (1) in accordance with a set-point torque. A change in the actual torque occurring during switching from mode into another is detected by the control device (16) and at least one of the operating parameters is influenced by the control device (16) in accordance with said change.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 35/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 41/1402 (2013.01); F02D 41/307 (2013.01); F02D 41/3818 (2013.01); F02D 31/007 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 2250/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949194A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813377 A1 19991007; EP 1003960 A2 20000531; EP 1003960 B1 20030702; JP 2002500726 A 20020108; US 6539914 B1 20030401; WO 9949194 A2 19990930; WO 9949194 A3 20000406

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070324

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060324

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060324

2005-05-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906175 P 20030807

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT