Global patent index - EP 1003964 A1

EP 1003964 A1 2000-05-31 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1003964 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966197 A

Priority

  • DE 9803581 W
  • DE 19818200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19818200A1] The valve has a valve body (1) held by a nut and containing a valve member (11) in a boring (9) with a radially widened compression chamber (20) which has an input channel (37) running into it. The valve has a seal element (40), moved axially by the valve member stroke. The seal element shuts off the compression cavity during injection pauses and opens it during injections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 45/12; F02M 61/10; F02M 61/16; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/12 (2006.01); F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/12 (2013.01); F02M 61/10 (2013.01); F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F02M 63/0205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956015A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19818200 A1 19991028; EP 1003964 A1 20000531; EP 1003964 B1 20040512; JP 2002507269 A 20020305; WO 9956015 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59811392

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-05-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-11-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811392

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020820

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB