Global Patent Index - EP 1003965 B1

EP 1003965 B1 2003-06-25 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1003965 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911578 A

Priority

  • DE 9900237 W
  • DE 19808068 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19808068A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve (1) with a nozzle body (5), for injecting fuel directly into the combustion chamber (3) of an internal combustion engine. To this end, the inventive fuel injection valve can be introduced into a locating bore (2) of a cylinder head (4) of the internal combustion engine. A metal ring (6) located on the nozzle body (5) deforms on heating, and so after the fuel injection valve (1) has been introduced into the locating bore (2), does not cause a radial compression of the fuel injection valve in said locating bore (2) until heated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14; F02M 53/04; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 53/04 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2013.01); F02M 53/04 (2013.01); F02M 61/166 (2013.01); F02M 2200/16 (2013.01); F02M 2200/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19808068 A1 19990902; EP 1003965 A1 20000531; EP 1003965 B1 20030625; JP 2001522435 A 20011113; JP 4308923 B2 20090805; KR 20010006536 A 20010126; US 6186123 B1 20010213; WO 9943950 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906080

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120201

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050129

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906080 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT