Global patent index - EP 1003969 A1

EP 1003969 A1 2000-05-31 - TWO-CYLINDER THICK MATTER PUMP

Title (en)

TWO-CYLINDER THICK MATTER PUMP

Title (de)

ZWEIZYLINDER-DICKSTOFFPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE POUR LIQUIDES EPAIS A DEUX CYLINDRES

Publication

EP 1003969 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945133 A

Priority

  • DE 19735091 A
  • EP 9804808 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909315A1] The invention relates to a two-cylinder thick matter pump for continuous delivery of a thick matter. Said pump has a reversing valve (5) which has a tubular separator housing (8, 8') with at least four openings (a-d). The tubular separator (6, 6'), which is fitted in the tubular separator housing (8, 8'), pivots with its outlet in front of the cylinder openings. The pump also has an inlet (RE) which is fixed to the suction pipe (3). The hollow space (H) in the tubular separator housing (8, 8') is constantly under manometric pressure. At least one blocking element (10) seals the suction pipe (3) and/or the first and/or second openings (a, b) of the tubular separator housing (8, 8').

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/02 (2006.01); F04B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 7/0026 (2013.01); F04B 7/0038 (2013.01); Y10S 417/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909315A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB GR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909315 A1 19990225; AT 219554 T 20020715; AU 727999 B2 20010104; AU 9256798 A 19990308; BR 9811171 A 20000725; CA 2299391 A1 19990225; CA 2299391 C 20061024; CN 1104558 C 20030402; CN 1265724 A 20000906; DE 19735091 A1 19990429; DE 19735091 B4 20060302; EP 1003969 A1 20000531; EP 1003969 B1 20020619; ES 2180197 T3 20030201; HK 1027149 A1 20030103; JP 2001515180 A 20010918; KR 100402197 B1 20031022; RU 2193110 C2 20021120; TR 200000345 T2 20000522; US 6450779 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090204

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080731

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-20 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2180197

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-11-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020403118

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804530

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-25

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 219554

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT