Global Patent Index - EP 1003973 A1

EP 1003973 A1 2000-05-31 - MICRO PUMP COMPRISING AN INLET CONTROL MEMBER FOR ITS SELF-PRIMING

Title (en)

MICRO PUMP COMPRISING AN INLET CONTROL MEMBER FOR ITS SELF-PRIMING

Title (de)

MIKROPUMPE MIT EINEM EINLASSSTEUERORGAN ZUM SELBSTANSAUGEN

Title (fr)

MICROPOMPE COMPRENANT UN ORGANE DE CONTROLE D'ENTREE PERMETTANT SON AUTO-AMORCAGE

Publication

EP 1003973 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98951326 A

Priority

  • EP 9805471 W
  • FR 9710497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909321A1] The invention concerns a micro pump (10; 100) comprising at least a first plate (12), and a second plate (20), an intermediate plate (18), a pumping chamber (24) and inlet and outlet control members (28, 30). The invention is characterised in that said inlet control member (28) is a non-return valve located on the greater part of said intermediate plate (18) thickness, consisting of a mobile member (40) and a part in the form of a membrane (42) located in the proximity of one of the plates (12, 20), linking said mobile member (40) to said intermediate plate (18) remainder and enabling, by its elasticity, the movement of said valve (28) between a closed position and an open position, said mobile member (40) being traversed by an orifice of limited volume.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 53/10; F04B 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B81B 3/00 (2006.01); F04B 43/04 (2006.01); F04B 53/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/043 (2013.01); F04B 53/1067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909321A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909321 A1 19990225; AU 9739898 A 19990308; CA 2301878 A1 19990225; CN 1097168 C 20021225; CN 1271407 A 20001025; DE 69813569 D1 20030522; DE 69813569 T2 20040408; EP 1003973 A1 20000531; EP 1003973 B1 20030416; JP 2001515183 A 20010918; US 6390791 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150819

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140819

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140819

2015-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69813569

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-03-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140301

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-02-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-01-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DEBIOTECH S.A.

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-10-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DEBIOTECH SA

- Free text: WESTONBRIDGE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED#DOLLARD HOUSE, WELLINGTON QUAY#DUBLIN 2 (IE) -TRANSFER TO- DEBIOTECH SA#AVENUE DE SEVELIN 28#1004 LAUSANNE (CH)

2005-05-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIETLIN & CIE SA

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69813569 P 20030522

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL