Global patent index - EP 1004058 A1

EP 1004058 A1 2000-05-31 - PRINTING SYSTEM AND PRINTING METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MIXED COLOUR SHEET SEQUENCE

Title (en)

PRINTING SYSTEM AND PRINTING METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MIXED COLOUR SHEET SEQUENCE

Title (de)

DRUCKSYSTEM UND DRUCKVERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINER FARBLICH GEMISCHTEN BLATTFOLGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'IMPRIMERIE SERVANT A PRODUIRE UNE SERIE DE FEUILLES DE COULEURS MELANGEES

Publication

EP 1004058 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948827 A

Priority

  • DE 19735152 A
  • EP 9805111 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909459A1] The invention relates to an adapted-performance printing or copying system for producing a predetermined sheet sequence made up of individual sheets printed in monochrome and/or colour. The inventive printing or copying system contains a high speed, monochrome or two-colour digital printer (10) and a digital colour-printer (11), these two printers being interconnected via a paper route connector module (16). A master control unit assigns the individual sheets to be printed to the printing units, said sheets being collected in a single sheet collection device (18). The monochrome and colour information from an original data flow are assigned to the printing unit and organised in terms of time in order to ensure that the print job is performed at an optimal speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00; G03G 15/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 21/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/65 (2013.01); G03G 15/00 (2013.01); G03G 15/01 (2013.01); G03G 15/0142 (2013.01); G03G 15/0194 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909459A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909459 A1 19990225; WO 9909459 A9 19990514; CA 2300177 A1 19990225; CA 2300177 C 20070925; DE 19881175 D2 20000810; EP 1004058 A1 20000531; EP 1004058 B1 20021113; JP 2001516067 A 20010925; US 6256463 B1 20010703; US 6363231 B1 20020326; WO 9909458 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080812

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080812

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070928

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806288

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-19

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB