Global Patent Index - EP 1004087 A1

EP 1004087 A1 2000-05-31 - IMPROVED ELECTRONIC ORDERING AND VENDING SYSTEMS

Title (en)

IMPROVED ELECTRONIC ORDERING AND VENDING SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTES ELEKTRONISCHES BESTELL- UND VERKAUFSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES ELECTRONIQUES AMELIORES DE COMMANDE ET DE DISTRIBUTION

Publication

EP 1004087 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98938532 A

Priority

  • AU 9800654 W
  • US 5612497 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909499A1] Method/apparatus of automatic retailing and vending for facilitating remote ordering of goods/services and provision of goods/services including plurality of ordering apparatus which are connectable via a communications network to a host device which includes intelligent retail shelf to store products, and means for issuing and receiving coupons and effecting rewards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60; G06F 153/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); G07F 7/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/12 (2013.01); G06Q 20/12 (2013.01); G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); G07F 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IE IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909499 A1 19990225; AU 2009236013 A1 20091210; AU 2009236013 B2 20111103; AU 8721598 A 19990308; BR 9811326 A 20000919; CA 2301918 A1 19990225; EP 1004087 A1 20000531; EP 1004087 A4 20020605; JP 2001516086 A 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029197

2005-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050426

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041013

2002-06-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT PT SE

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMAGING TECHNOLOGIES PTY LIMITED

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT PT SE