Global Patent Index - EP 1004095 A1

EP 1004095 A1 2000-05-31 - IMPROVED TRAVEL PASS/TICKET ISSUING AND/OR VALIDATING SYSTEM

Title (en)

IMPROVED TRAVEL PASS/TICKET ISSUING AND/OR VALIDATING SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERBESSERTES SYSTEM ZUR AUSGABE UND/ODER ZUM ERKENNEN VON FAHRBERECHTIGUNGSKARTEN/FAHRKARTEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE VALIDATION ET/OU D'EMISSION DE TICKET/CARTE DE TRANSPORT AMELIORE

Publication

EP 1004095 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98937672 A

Priority

  • GB 9802355 W
  • GB 9717049 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2328309A] A travel pass system wherein travel passes are encoded with a geographical identity (GID) for at least the beginning and end of the journey, includes a ticket machine on board the transport vehicle containing a CPU, and an operator interchangeable module containing a look-up table of valid boarding/destination and intermediate (via) points, enabling travel passes to be validated by comparison of the GIDs encoded in the pass with the GIDs stored in the look-up table. The GIDs may be by postcode, national grid (NG ID) or ground positioning satellite (GPS ID). Pass invalid information may be displayed in either lenient or strict modes whereby in strict mode the ticket machine is arranged to reject the pass outright and the passenger is asked to leave the vehicle or in lenient mode the vehicle operative is alerted and the ticket machine displays text information. A printed ticket may also be issued.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/02 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909524A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2328309 A 19990217; GB 2328309 B 20011212; GB 9816911 D0 19980930; AU 8639398 A 19990308; CA 2300048 A1 19990225; EP 1004095 A1 20000531; GB 9717049 D0 19971015; WO 9909524 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1028287

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-04-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SYSTEM FOR ISSUING AND CHECKING TRAVEL TICKETS

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000210

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000209;LT PAYMENT 20000209;LV PAYMENT 20000209;MK PAYMENT 20000209;RO PAYMENT 20000209;SI PAYMENT 20000209