Global patent index - EP 1004097 A1

EP 1004097 A1 2000-05-31 - CONSTITUTING SECURITY ELEMENTS WITH OPTICAL DIFFRACTION EFFECT, AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING SUCH ELEMENTS

Title (en)

CONSTITUTING SECURITY ELEMENTS WITH OPTICAL DIFFRACTION EFFECT, AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING SUCH ELEMENTS

Title (de)

AUFBAU BEUGUNGSOPTISCH WIRKSAMER SICHERHEITSELEMENTE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRÜFUNG DERARTIGER ELEMENTE

Title (fr)

CONSTITUTION D'ELEMENTS DE SECURITE A EFFET OPTIQUE DE DIFFRACTION, ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE CONTROLE DE TELS ELEMENTS

Publication

EP 1004097 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932022 A

Priority

  • DE 9801178 W
  • DE 19734855 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734855A1] Assembly has optical diffraction element, and produces marking as optically variable device with metallised layer and pattern by removing sections

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/02 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/0013 (2013.01); G07D 7/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909527A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734855 A1 19990218; DE 19734855 B4 20050908; AT 212143 T 20020215; AU 8208198 A 19990308; BG 104143 A 20000630; BG 64293 B1 20040831; BR 9811153 A 20000725; CA 2300961 A1 19990225; CN 1265761 A 20000906; DK 1004097 T3 20020506; EP 1004097 A1 20000531; EP 1004097 B1 20020116; ES 2172157 T3 20020916; HU 0003358 A2 20010228; HU 0003358 A3 20021128; ID 25447 A 20001005; JP 2003517646 A 20030527; NO 20000615 A 20000407; NO 20000615 D0 20000208; PL 187652 B1 20040831; PL 338473 A1 20001106; PT 1004097 E 20020731; SK 1782000 A3 20001009; TR 200000651 T2 20000821; WO 9909527 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-05 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2008-06-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20070821

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-17 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20080409

2008-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-03-26 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20070821

2008-03-26 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20070821

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070502

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070412

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-12 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070412

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070330

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050424

2005-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2005-01-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20021010

2004-02-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2003-06-11 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20021010

2003-04-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-02-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2002-12-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172157

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020401455

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020415

2002-07-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-05-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-04-22 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802653

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-02-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 212143

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-07-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: STRUCTURE OF A SECURITY ELEMENT WITH OPTICAL DIFFRACTION EFFECT, AND DEVICE FOR CHECKING SUCH ELEMENTS

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE