Global Patent Index - EP 1004103 A1

EP 1004103 A1 2000-05-31 - COLLECTING DEVICE FOR PARKING METER WITH STANDPOST STRUCTURE

Title (en)

COLLECTING DEVICE FOR PARKING METER WITH STANDPOST STRUCTURE

Title (de)

SAMMELVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE PARKUHR MIT PFOSTENSTRUKTUR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE POUR UN HORODATEUR A STRUCTURE EN BORNE

Publication

EP 1004103 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98942745 A

Priority

  • FR 9801810 W
  • FR 9710447 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2767594A1] In closed position the coin removal device blocks the money box outlet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/06; G07F 17/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/06 (2006.01); G07F 17/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/24 (2013.01); G07F 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909529A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2767594 A1 19990226; FR 2767594 B1 20030905; AT 255755 T 20031215; AU 746513 B2 20020502; AU 9076398 A 19990308; DE 69820270 D1 20040115; DE 69820270 T2 20040902; EP 1004103 A1 20000531; EP 1004103 B1 20031203; ES 2213911 T3 20040901; US 6568589 B1 20030527; WO 9909529 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-02 [REG SE EUG] EP PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-09-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180813

2018-08-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69820270

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2008-11-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PARKEON

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-05-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: AXALTO S.A.

2008-03-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMES

- Effective date: 20040831

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: AXALTO S.A.

2004-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMES

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-10-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMES

2004-09-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AXALTO S.A.

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213911 T3

2004-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-03-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820270 P 20040115

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-07-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COLLECTING DEVICE FOR PARKING METER WITH STANDPOST STRUCTURE

2003-06-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COLLECTING DEVICE FOR PARKING METER WITH STANDPOST STRUCTURE

2003-05-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COLLECTING DEVICE FOR PARKING METER WITH STANDPOST STRUCTURE

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI GB IE IT LI NL PT SE