Global Patent Index - EP 1004110 A1

EP 1004110 A1 2000-05-31 - DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING ALPHANUMERIC CHARACTERS AND SYMBOLS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING ALPHANUMERIC CHARACTERS AND SYMBOLS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON ALPHA-NUMERISCHEN ZEICHEN UND BILDZEICHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR AFFICHER DES CARACTERES ET DES SYMBOLES ALPHANUMERIQUES

Publication

EP 1004110 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97928220 A

Priority

  • DE 29611155 U
  • DE 29621296 U
  • EP 9703145 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9750070A1] The invention concerns a device for displaying alphanumeric characters and/or symbols, with a rotationally symmetric housing (19) of a transparent and/or light transparent material; the housing (19) containing an electric motor (2) with a motor shaft (20) which revolves around a symmetrical axis (21); a carrier (5) which is rotationally fixed to the motor shaft (20) and on which is/are attached at least one row of light-emitting diodes or groups of light-emitting diodes (6) that are substantially perpendicular to the motor shaft (20); and a circuit board (4) with a control circuit for the light-emitting diodes (6). To improve control of the display device and the LED's and to create a technically simple series production, the display device also has an opto-electronic measuring device (15) made of a transmitter and receiver, to measure the rotating speed of the carrier (5) for synchronising control of the light-emitting diodes (6) with the rotating speed of the carrier (5), the transmitter and receiver of which are fixed to a rotating structural part of the device on the one hand to a stationary structural part of the device on the other hand, opposite and at a short distance apart. With the use of software the signal picked up by the receiver can be converted into a clear square-wave signal, free from external interference so that the LED-control can be synchronised with the exactly or almost exactly measured rotating speed of the carrier (5). The device according to the invention also contains a mechanical balancing element (7, 8) opposite the carrier (5) in relation to the symmetrical axis (21), wherein the balancing element (7, 8) is a rod (7) of any cross-section, the operating length of which can be shortened, the rod being raised into a substantially horizontal position during operating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 9/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/33 (2006.01); G09G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/33 (2013.01); G09G 3/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9750070A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9750070 A1 19971231; AT 203846 T 20010815; AU 3259897 A 19980114; EP 1004110 A1 20000531; EP 1004110 B1 20010801; ES 2162307 T3 20011216

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59704216

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110615

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-06-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050617

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020617

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LUMINO LICHT ELEKTRONIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-07-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-06-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-06-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-06-17 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-06-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020612

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020607

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2162307 T3

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-11-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-11-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-11-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-11-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-11-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59704216 20010906

2001-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 203846 T 20010815

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990415

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE