Global Patent Index - EP 1004133 A4

EP 1004133 A4 2000-05-31 - STARTING AID THAT SURROUNDS AN ELECTRODE OF A LOW PRESSURE DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (en)

STARTING AID THAT SURROUNDS AN ELECTRODE OF A LOW PRESSURE DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (de)

ZÜNDHILFE IN DER HÜLSE EINER NIEDERDRUCKENTLADUNGSLAMPE

Title (fr)

AIDE A L'AMOR AGE ENTOURANT UNE ELECTRODE D'UNE LAMPE A DECHARGE A FAIBLE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1004133 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98911636 A

Priority

  • US 9804989 W
  • US 4075797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840900A1] A discharge lamp (10) having an envelope (12), a first electrode (26), a second electrode (28), a conductive starting aid (34) that is enclosed in the envelope and located around the inner end (30) of the first electrode, a fill material (50) located in an enclosed volume (16), and a photoemissive coating (64) formed on the inner surface of the envelope is disclosed; wherein, the starting aid (34) yields a more reliable lamp for starting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 1/62; H01J 63/04; H01J 17/30; H01J 17/46; H01J 17/04; H01J 61/04; H01J 61/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/10 (2006.01); H01J 17/30 (2006.01); H01J 17/46 (2006.01); H01J 61/54 (2006.01); H01J 63/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/547 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] DE 19730888 A1 19990128 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 03 28 April 1995 (1995-04-28)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 03 28 April 1995 (1995-04-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 475 (E - 1601) 5 September 1994 (1994-09-05)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 167 (E - 258) 2 August 1984 (1984-08-02)
  • See also references of WO 9840900A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840900 A1 19980917; CA 2283824 A1 19980917; EP 1004133 A1 20000531; EP 1004133 A4 20000531; JP 2001514796 A 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030812

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020102

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990913

2000-05-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL