Global Patent Index - EP 1004134 A1

EP 1004134 A1 2000-05-31 - ELECTRON MULTIPLIER ARRAY

Title (en)

ELECTRON MULTIPLIER ARRAY

Title (de)

ELEKTRONENVERVIELFACHERMATRIX

Title (fr)

MULTIPLICATEUR D'ELECTRONS

Publication

EP 1004134 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98938821 A

Priority

  • GB 9802447 W
  • GB 9717210 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909577A1] The electron multiplier array consists of alternate layers of metallic material (16) and insulator (14) deposited over an array of anodes (12) on a substrate. The layers are deposited in turn on the substrate and holes are etched through each of the layers to form an array of channels (10) over the array of anodes (12). The array repeat of the electron multiplier array is less than 0.5 mm and individual layers have a thickness of between 10 and 500 micron. This permits the fabrication of much smaller devices that are less susceptible to high magnetic fields.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/12; H01J 43/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/12 (2006.01); H01J 43/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 43/045 (2013.01); H01J 9/125 (2013.01); H01J 43/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909577A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909577 A1 19990225; EP 1004134 A1 20000531; EP 1004134 B1 20031112; GB 9717210 D0 19971022

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100814

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100814

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040813

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030102

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB