Global Patent Index - EP 1004151 A2

EP 1004151 A2 2000-05-31 - IMPROVED REFLECTOR ANTENNA WITH A SELF-SUPPORTED FEED

Title (en)

IMPROVED REFLECTOR ANTENNA WITH A SELF-SUPPORTED FEED

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE REFLEKTORANTENNE MIT SELBSTTRAGENDEM SPEISEELEMENT

Title (fr)

VERSION AMELIOREE D'UNE ANTENNE A REFLECTEUR DOTEE D'UNE ALIMENTATION AUTOPORTEE

Publication

EP 1004151 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98941971 A

Priority

  • SE 9801478 W
  • US 5622097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910950A2] The invention consists of improvements of reflector antennas with self-supported feeds. The feed consists of a waveguide tube, a dielectric joint and a sub-reflector. The tube is attached to the center of the rotationally symmetric reflector and extends to the focal region of it. The sub-reflector is located in front of the tube, and the surface of this sub-reflector is provided with rotationally symmetric grooves also called corrugations. The improvements of the present invention are (1) a ring focus reflector to improve the gain of the antenna, (2) an elevated central region of the reflector to reduce the return loss, (3) metal screws or cylinders to strongly fasten the sub-reflector to the tube, (4) corrugations or other similar means around the rim or the reflector in order to reduce far-out sidelobes, (5) dual-band operation by means of a coaxial waveguide outside the circular waveguide in the tube, and (6) dielectric filling or covering of the corrugations or of the region between the corrugations and the waveguide tubeend, both in order to avoid the gathering of water, dust or other undesired material in this area which could destroy the performance of the antenna.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/42 (2006.01); H01Q 15/14 (2006.01); H01Q 19/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/134 (2013.01); H01Q 1/42 (2013.01); H01Q 15/147 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910950A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910950 A2 19990304; WO 9910950 A3 19990520; AU 9011998 A 19990316; BR 9811241 A 20000815; CN 1151590 C 20040526; CN 1271470 A 20001025; DE 69836636 D1 20070125; EP 1004151 A2 20000531; EP 1004151 B1 20061213

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160802

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150818

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140808

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140813

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070818

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070818

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-04-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-03-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070324

2007-03-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69836636

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-01-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2006-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

SI

2006-12-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-12-13 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040906

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000203