Global patent index - EP 1004156 A2

EP 1004156 A2 2000-05-31 - ELECTRICAL DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1004156 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98945007 A

Priority

  • DE 9802005 W
  • DE 19734859 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734859A1] The invention relates to an electrical device (1), especially a car radio, requiring little technical expenditure in order to be produced. The electrical device (1) comprises a display device (5) and control elements (10). A transparent plate (20) is provided. The display device (5) is arranged in front of said plate. The plate (20) has a contact strip (25) with terminal contacts (30) for the display device. Contact areas (35,40) are arranged on the plate and contact occurs by means of the control elements (10). The contact strip (25) has terminal contacts (45,50) for the contact areas (35, 40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 33/10 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 13/702 (2006.01); H04B 1/08 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2013.01); H01H 2207/022 (2013.01); H01H 2209/04 (2013.01); H01H 2209/082 (2013.01); H01H 2231/026 (2013.01); H01H 2231/036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908344A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734859 A1 19990225; DE 19734859 C2 20010222; EP 1004156 A2 20000531; EP 1004156 B1 20020403; JP 2001512860 A 20010828; US 6353194 B1 20020305; WO 9908344 A2 19990218; WO 9908344 A3 19990415

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050717

2005-07-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050717

2005-07-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050717

2004-07-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040720

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-08-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020826

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803642

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-08

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 24/00 A

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT