Global Patent Index - EP 1004190 A1

EP 1004190 A1 2000-05-31 - COMMON TIME REFERENCE FOR PACKET SWITCHES

Title (en)

COMMON TIME REFERENCE FOR PACKET SWITCHES

Title (de)

GEMEINSAME REFERENZZEIT FÜR PAKETVERMITTLUNGEN

Title (fr)

REFERENCE DE TEMPS COMMUNE POUR COMMUTATION DE PAQUETS DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1004190 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927505 A

Priority

  • US 9913311 W
  • US 8889198 P
  • US 8889398 P
  • US 8890698 P
  • US 8891498 P
  • US 8891598 P
  • US 8898398 P
  • US 12051598 A
  • US 12052998 A
  • US 12063698 A
  • US 12067298 A
  • US 12070098 A
  • US 12094498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965198A1] The invention describes a method for transmitting and forwarding packets over a packet switching network via communication links with variable delays. The switches (10) of the network maintain a common time reference (002), which is obtained either from an external source or is generated and distributed internally. A packet that arrives to an input port (30) of a switch (10) is switched to an output port (40) based on specific routing information in the packet header. Each switch (10) along a route form a source to a destination forwards packets in periodic time intervals that are predefined using the common time reference. The time interval duration can be longer than the time duration required for transmitting a packet, in which case the exact position of a packet in the time interval is not predetermined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/64 (2006.01); H04L 12/801 (2013.01); H04L 12/815 (2013.01); H04L 12/841 (2013.01); H04L 12/861 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04J 3/06 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 47/28 (2013.01); H04L 12/6418 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 47/10 (2013.01); H04L 47/22 (2013.01); H04L 49/90 (2013.01); H04J 3/0644 (2013.01); H04J 3/0685 (2013.01); H04J 2203/0082 (2013.01); H04J 2203/0083 (2013.01); H04L 69/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965198 A1 19991216; AT 359647 T 20070515; CA 2308184 A1 19991216; CA 2308215 A1 19991216; EP 1004189 A1 20000531; EP 1004189 A4 20020502; EP 1004189 B1 20070411; EP 1004190 A1 20000531; EP 1004190 A4 20020502; WO 9965197 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-05-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04L 12/66 A, 7H 04Q 11/04 B, 7H 04L 12/56 B, 7H 04L 12/64 B

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNCHRODYNE NETWORKS, INC.

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE