Global Patent Index - EP 1004212 A1

EP 1004212 A1 2000-05-31 - METHOD FOR DISSEMINATING SERVICE INFORMATION, SYSTEM AND CENTRAL SERVICE INFORMATION STATION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DISSEMINATING SERVICE INFORMATION, SYSTEM AND CENTRAL SERVICE INFORMATION STATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERBREITUNG VON SERVICE-INFORMATIONEN, EIN SYSTEM UND EINE SERVICE-INFORMATIONSZENTRALE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DIFFUSION D'INFORMATIONS DE SERVICE, SYSTEME ET CENTRAL D'INFORMATIONS DE SERVICE

Publication

EP 1004212 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945010 A

Priority

  • DE 9802008 W
  • DE 19735836 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735836A1] The invention relates to regional dissemination of service information, to a system and to a central service information station. The central station (3) of a cellular radio network receives service information (S1,S2) and local information (01,02) from a central service information station (1). The local information received (01=20,21,etc.), fixes the region (23) where each piece of service information (S1) is to be sent by designating in each case at least one group (20,21 etc.) of cells pertaining to the cellular radio network in said region. The membership of cells of a precise respective group (20,21) is fixed or can be fixed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04W 4/06 (2009.01); G08G 1/0967 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 4/06 (2013.01); G01S 2205/002 (2013.01); G08G 1/0967 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908461A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735836 A1 19990218; EP 1004212 A1 20000531; JP 2001513611 A 20010904; WO 9908461 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050112

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VODAFONE AG

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE